THE MILTON KEYNES CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church is the advancement of Christian religion according to the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £30,047 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 17 July 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tao Wang | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne LK Chan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yin Yee Chris Ho | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Haifeng Xie | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yi Han | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wing-Yee Cecilia Teh | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Huang | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Pang | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Keng Hung Chan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Oi-Yee Lau | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tsui Ling Ng | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.82k | £94.89k | £110.16k | £129.86k | £230.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.46k | £62.78k | £83.25k | £61.68k | £122.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JULY 1995, AS AMENDED 5TH NOVEMBER 1995, 17TH MARCH 1996, 26TH MAY 1996 AND 15 JUNE 2003 as amended on 05 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Howes Percival LLP
Bell House
First Floor
Seebeck Place
Knowlhill
MILTON K
- Phone:
- 07376264567
- Email:
- mkccc.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window