Governing document THE MILTON KEYNES CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity Number: 1056899

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JULY 1995, AS AMENDED 5TH NOVEMBER 1995, 17TH MARCH 1996, 26TH MAY 1996 AND 15 JUNE 2003 as amended on 05 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE MILTON KEYNES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.