Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN PENPARC

Charity number: 1056905
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 May 2018 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 February 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 03 February 2017 3 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 11 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 11 June 2015 On Time