GA-DANME NIKASEMO ASAFO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has been organising the followinf activities; 1. Playschemes during the summer and winter holiday breaks for children between the ages of 5 and 12. which provide opportunity to stay close to their culture 2. Language school for for mother tougne languages. 3. Celebration of annual Homowo-Asafotufiam-Nmaayem festival of the GaDangme people of Ghana
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Hackney
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Haringey
- Islington
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Merton
- Southwark
Governance
- 18 July 1996: Standard registration
- 09 March 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 April 2012: Re-registered
- 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 April 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Dinsey | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Esther Lamptey | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADE SAWYERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEN ARYEETEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA ARYEETEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15k | £3.20k | £1.23k | £1.79k | £940 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99k | £5.40k | £1.76k | £1.00k | £140 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH MAY 1996
Charitable objects
(1) THE TEACHING AND LEARNING OF THE GA-DANME AND GHANAIAN LANGUAGES IN BRITAIN (2) THE LEARNING AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ON THE GA-DANME AND GHANAIN LANGUAGES HISTORY CULTURE AND TRADITIONS (3) THE WELFARE OF ALL GA-DANME GHANAINS AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE - GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MANSHIP ROAD
MITCHAM
CR4 2AY
- Phone:
- 07958750531
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window