Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ATHELSTAN HOUSE

Charity number: 1056919
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 01 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 06 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 06 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 15 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required