THE REG VARDY BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Active senior section brass band representing the Northern Area at National and International events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 18 July 1996: Standard registration
- The EverReady Band (Working name)
- THE EVER READY BRASS BAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Maurice Dye | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gavin Mark Brown | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Alexander Wakeling | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE JAMES PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.82k | £11.00k | £21.93k | £14.49k | £36.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.39k | £5.71k | £21.24k | £29.07k | £42.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED 28 JUNE 1996 AND 10 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF BRASS BAND MUSIC MAKING AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE SAID ART BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, MUSIC FESTIVALS, AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES AND TO ENCOURAGE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PLAYERS BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION AND TRAINING FACILITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ALSTON WAY
MEADOWFIELD
DURHAM
DH7 8XF
- Phone:
- 07946761108
- Email:
- colindye50@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window