LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1056926
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of a Pre-School in Kingsnorth, Ashford, Kent.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £140,451
Total expenditure: £135,054

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1996: Standard registration
  • 10 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 10 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1185961 LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £146.98k £145.85k £131.97k £129.61k £140.45k
Total expenditure £137.36k £143.85k £139.73k £120.29k £135.05k
Income from government contracts £112.54k £103.62k £86.91k £94.35k £97.14k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time