THE ARTISAN INITIATIVES CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Christians involved in the Media, Arts and Fashion industries through pastoral support and monthly prayer gatherings in various cities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 July 1996: Standard registration
- 24 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53 | £55.91k | £45.81k | £45.27k | £44.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68 | £58.93k | £51.13k | £46.11k | £45.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 21 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 21 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 28 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 28 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 06 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 14 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ULTIMATE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND PASTORAL CARE OF YOUNG MUSICIANS ESPECIALLY THROUGH THE CHURCHES, SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window