Accounts and annual returns THE HEDGE END MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1056957
Charity reporting is overdue by 1298 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1298 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1298 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required