THE HEDGE END MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To use money donated to the Trust to benefit the patients of Hedge End Medical Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 July 1996: Standard registration
- HEDGE END MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hannah Yates | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sam Heal | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN BUSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARK HOLLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KARL GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN PUSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ELIZABETH CROPLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £703 | £1.77k | £1.25k | £1.09k | £2.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £3.87k | £1 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED 10 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS RESIDING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FUNDS FOR THE PURCHASE AND MAINTENANCE OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR THE HEDGE END MEDICAL CENTRE NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED UNDER THE NHS
Area of benefit
HEDGE END, SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Medical Centre
24 Lower Northam Road
Hedge End
Southampton
SO30 4FQ
- Phone:
- 01489785722
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window