FRIENDS OF NEWCOMBES SURGERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise various fundraising events throughout the year to raise money for the provision of essential additional equipment and resources at Newcombe's Surgery, Crediton which benefits both the patients and the staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 19 July 1996: Standard registration
- 28 February 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 February 2022: Funds transferred to 1028757 Redlands league of friends
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.38k | £2.42k | £2.91k | £28.40k | £238 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.65k | £2.03k | £1.62k | £1.41k | £33.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 31 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 1996.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF THE NEWCOMBES SURGERY RESIDING IN CREDITON OR IN ANY OF ITS SURROUNDING VILLAGES WITH THE MID DEVON LOCAL AUTHORITY DISTRICT BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR PATIENTS OF THE SURGERY ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE DOCTORS PRACTISING.
Area of benefit
CREDITON, MID DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window