Trustees NORWICH AND NORFOLK MUSLIM ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1056974

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HAYDER ABDELMUTTI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ali Abdulrahman ALsohaibani | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr SAUD MUSLIH ALMUTAIRI | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMED CHILENGE | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SOLIMAN MOHAMMAD ALHAMED | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AHMED ALGHUBAYRI | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMED ABU-ELMAGD | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHID MAHDI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MASOUD GADIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HAYDER SIDAHMED ABDELMUTTI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDULLA DAWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.