Financial history THE DUDLEY GROUP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITY

Charity Number: 1056979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £349.00k £1.09m £701.00k £723.00k £565.03k
Total expenditure £487.00k £777.00k £625.00k £565.00k £673.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.01m £436.00k £379.00k £335.83k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £30.00k £86.00k £94.00k £114.05k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £130.00k £158.00k £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £54.00k £48.00k £76.00k £109.91k
Income - Other N/A £1.00k £1.00k £16.00k £5.24k
Income - Legacies N/A £2.00k £265.00k £167.00k £131.37k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £678.00k £400.00k £340.00k £444.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £79.00k £206.00k £159.00k £195.97k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £61.00k £20.00k £24.00k £33.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £87.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £20.00k £19.00k £66.00k £33.47k