HERTFORD VALE PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the pupils at the Hertford Vale Primary School by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities not normally provided by the Local Authority
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 July 1996: Standard registration
- 14 November 2024: Funds received from 1078329 HERTFORD VALE PLAYGROUP
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Bradbury | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.49k | £4.55k | £1.20k | £2.33k | £2.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124 | £4.93k | £28 | £173 | £448 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE HERTFORD VALE PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HERTFORD VALE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
INGS LANE
STAXTON
SCARBOROUGH
YO12 4SS
- Phone:
- 01944710273
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window