Trustees BELARUSIAN CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1057033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAVIL SHEVTSOV Chair 25 March 2000
None on record
Ihar Labacevich Trustee 12 November 2022
None on record
Aliaksandr Kasiak Trustee 29 April 2020
None on record
MR S PIATKEVICH Trustee 25 March 2002
None on record
JANKA JASWILOWICZ Trustee 25 March 1997
None on record
MR V EVDOKIMOV Trustee 25 March 1997
None on record