Trustees HERSDEN UNDER FIVES PROJECT

Charity number: 1057036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amanda Stanger Chair 03 December 2015
None on record
Leah Williams-Benoit Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Elizabeth O'Donoghue Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Sharonjit Bhangu Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Rachel Collins Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Kristine Likaj Trustee 10 December 2021
None on record
ANDREW KITE Trustee 16 October 2014
None on record