SOMALI PROGRESSIVE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides advice, support, advocacy to Somali people in Cardiff and Vale. The Association runs projects promoting take up of services and provides bilingual staff where possible. The Association with statutory and voluntary sectors to provide service in partnerships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 24 July 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDIRAHMAN AHMED AWED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew John Phillips | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ABDIKARIM ABDI ADAN | Trustee | 21 May 1998 |
|
|
||||
HUSSEIN ABDI NOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALI MOHAMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAISA SALEH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED ALI NOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELMI PETER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £800 | £823 | £983 | £977 | £924 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £963 | £1.03k | £993 | £824 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 February 2024 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 February 2024 | 744 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2024 | 1109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THOSE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) TO RELEIVE THE MEMBERS OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICE. 3) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATION BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS GENERALLY AND PARTICULARLY THOSE OF SOMALI ORIGIN AND OTHER INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SOUTH GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 JAMES STREET
CARDIFF
CF10 5EZ
- Phone:
- 02920499916
- Email:
- abdi@spawales.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window