CYLCH MEITHRIN NANTGAREDIG A'R FRO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Cylch Meithrin is to offer early years care and education, to provide a sustainable social environment and to promote healthy eating to every child under school age through the medium of Welsh. Activities: Learning activity, arts & crafts, gardening, outdoor play, story telling and singing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £923 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 25 July 1996: Standard registration
- CYLCH MEITHRIN NANTGAREDIG (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nerys Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Haf James | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anwen Butler | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.27k | £31.94k | £34.92k | £41.01k | £11.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.36k | £20.86k | £26.42k | £39.92k | £17.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.59k | £1.25k | £9.26k | £923 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 312 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 June 2023 | 494 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Felingwm Community Hall
Felingwm
SA32 7PR
- Phone:
- 07447924455
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window