Financial history North Staffordshire Combined Healthcare NHS Trust

Charity number: 1057104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.89k £8.48k £4.66k £6.98k £265.45k
Total expenditure £479.34k £12.92k £19.07k £15.59k £17.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A