North Staffordshire Combined Healthcare NHS Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the delivery of local healthcare services. Support the development of staff, staff facilities and the patient environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 06 March 1997: Standard registration
- 31 October 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- Combined Charity (Working name)
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - UMBRELLA CHARITY (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE COMBINED HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.89k | £8.48k | £4.66k | £6.98k | £265.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £479.34k | £12.92k | £19.07k | £15.59k | £17.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/06/96 as amended on 14 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICES PROVIDED AT NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - BRADWELL HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - BUCKNALL HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - CGH HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - CHEADLE HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - LEEK MOORLANDS HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - LONGTON HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - ST EDWARDS HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - STALLINGTON HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - STANFIELDS HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE - WESTCLIFFE HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- THE NORTH STAFFS COMBINED HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- 06 March 1997 : Standard registration
- 31 October 2024 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
N STAFFS COMBINED HCARE NHS TRUST
LAWTON HOUSE BELLRINGER ROAD
TRENTHAM LAKES SOUTH
STOKE ON TRENT
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST4 8HH
- Phone:
- 0300 123 1535
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window