CONTRABAND PRODUCTIONS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 1996: Standard registration
- 01 November 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 FEBRUARY 1996 AND 18 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATIONOF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN CULTURE AND ARTS WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF INTERNATIONAL THEATRE AND TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING OF OTHER CULTURES THROUGH INTERNATIONAL EXCHANGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window