Financial history HEALD GREEN VILLAGE HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1057143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.05k £45.27k £34.63k £28.79k £32.73k
Total expenditure £31.84k £26.86k £33.77k £32.45k £32.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.30k N/A N/A N/A