THE BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote effective voluntary action within the three boroughs within which it works. This is done by providing a wide range of advice, information, support and training to local groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 29 July 1996: Standard registration
- C V S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Shepherd | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHIRAGKUMAR KHAJURIYA | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|||||
TRACY HOPKINS | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jed Sullivan | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.65k | £11.85k | £1.07k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 APRIL 1996 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 JULY 1996 AND 4 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whittles Chartered Accountants
1 Richmond Road
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
FY8 1PE
- Phone:
- 07711501516
- Email:
- cvsinfo@cvsbwf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window