MONKTON COMBE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's primary objective is the provision of education. It runs an independent co-educational day and boarding school within the Evangelical Anglican tradition, catering for pupils aged 2 to 18 from the local area and also further afield, both from the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£24,402,001
Donations and legacies | £403.54k | |
Charitable activities | £20.70m | |
Other trading activities | £742.52k | |
Investments | £215.05k | |
Other | £2.34m |
Total expenditure:
£22,726,051
Raising funds | £1.07m | |
Charitable activities | £21.66m | |
Other | £0 |
£223,062 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £21.66m | |
Retained for future use | £1.68m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £21.66m | |
Retained for future use | £1.90m |
People

443 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 11 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 29 July 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Ewan McKendrick | Chair | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Wright | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Johannes Bester | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Silver | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret White | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alex Thomas Lyttle | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair John Reid | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Lloyd Samuel Thomas | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Sarah Kingerley Hubbard | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ed Shaw | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN ROSSER BSC MRICS | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BURCHELL MARTIN YOUNG | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|||||
JULIAN PRINGLE | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.33m | £15.20m | £17.16m | £22.74m | £24.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.75m | £14.63m | £17.33m | £22.40m | £22.73m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £606.45k | £273.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £318.00k | £307.22k | £640.71k | £308.44k | £403.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £270.36k | £317.82k | £614.06k | £734.94k | £742.52k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.75m | £13.29m | £15.63m | £21.26m | £20.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £50.61k | £52.20k | £56.88k | £68.46k | £215.05k | |
|
Income - Other | £941.23k | £1.23m | £218.77k | £371.66k | £2.34m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £500 | £126.01k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £15.19m | £14.10m | £16.58m | £21.40m | £21.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £561.03k | £153.11k | £171.90k | £1.00m | £1.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £142.99k | £96.64k | £154.41k | £78.29k | £69.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £380.94k | £580.09k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £25.42m | £27.28m | £29.73m | £30.51m | £29.60m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.90m | £3.39m | £2.63m | £2.20m | £2.50m | |
|
Other assets | £2.70m | £2.99m | £3.48m | £3.21m | £10.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.88m | £8.52m | £11.56m | £11.39m | £16.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 MAR 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TO ESTABLISH OR ACQUIRE AND MAINTAIN A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS COMBINED WITH SOUND RELIGIOUS TRAINING ON PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL PRINCIPLES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BUT SO THAT EACH SUCH SCHOOL SHALL BE CARRIED ON AS AN EDUCATIONAL CHARITY; AS AN INDEPENDENT OBJECT TO ESTABLISH OR ACQUIRE AS A GOING CONCERN AND CARRY ON OR MANAGE ELSEWHERE ANY SUBSIDIARY AFFILIATED OR OTHER SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS COMBINED WITH SOUND RELIGIOUS TRAINING ON PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL PRINCIPLES BUT SO THAT EACH SUCH SCHOOL SHALL BE CARRIED ON AS AN EDUCATIONAL CHARITY; (THE “OBJECTS”).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MONKTON COMBE SCHOOL
CHURCH LANE
MONKTON COMBE
BATH
BA2 7HG
- Phone:
- 01225721143
- Email:
- bursar@monkton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window