THE FASHION AND TEXTILE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a museum of British fashion and textile design. Research and education in the fields of fashion, design and textiles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 July 1996: Standard registration
- THE FASHION AND TEXTILE MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE ZANDRA RHODES MUSEUM OF FASHION & TEXTILES (Working name)
- THE ZANDRA RHODES FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE ZANDRA RHODES MUSEUM OF FASHION AND TEXTILES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Howard Stephen | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|||||
ZANDRA RHODES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £85 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 June 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 39 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH JULY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 16TH OCTOBER 2002 AND 13TH NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF CONTEMPORARY BRITISH FASHION WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE DESIGN OF TEXTILES AND CLOTHING OF THE 1960S TO THE 1980S IN PARTICULAR BY ESTABLISHING AND PROVIDING A PUBLIC MUSEUM OF CONTEMPORARY BRITISH CLOTHING AND TEXTILE DESIGN.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWHAM COLLEGE OF FURTHER EDUCATION
EAST HAM CAMPUS
HIGH STREET SOUTH
LONDON
E6 6ER
- Phone:
- 02082574357
- Email:
- Judith.Nelson@newham.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window