HOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of the sick, the physically or mentally disabled and the elderly Relief of poverty the provision of relief for victims of disasters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 July 1996: Standard registration
- HEBREW ORDER OF DAVID LODGE LONDON NO 1 (Working name)
- HEBREW ORDER OF DAVID LODGE LONDON NO 3 (Working name)
- HEBREW ORDER OF DAVID LODGE LONDON NO4 (Working name)
- HEBREW ORDER OF DAVID YITZHAKRABIN LODGE LONDON NO 2 (Working name)
- HEBREW ORDER OF DAVID, CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- HEBREW ORDER OF DAVID, LONDON NO 1 CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence David Gishen | Chair | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Howard Panas | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joel Tannenbaum | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hubert | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTON TEPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.75k | £67.35k | £78.02k | £71.14k | £102.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.61k | £50.35k | £65.69k | £80.35k | £105.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH JULY 1996 AS AMENDED ON 10TH APRIL 1997 AND 26TH JULY 2005
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK, THE PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED, THE DISABLED AND THE AGED 2. THE RELIEF OF VICTIMS OF DISASTERS 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Elmgate Gardens
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 9RT
- Phone:
- 07765258616
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window