ADVOCACY FOR OLDER PEOPLE IN GREENWICH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide one to one advocacy to vulnerable people over 55 living in Greenwich on a wide range of issues: accessing statutory services, making complaints, financial issues and housing problems. We promote the rights of older people and help them overcome discrimination and maintain their independence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
Governance
- 31 July 1996: Standard registration
- 13 December 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AFOP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.26k | £96.18k | £95.29k | £125.54k | £235.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.18k | £94.76k | £99.23k | £113.07k | £276.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 12 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 12 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 09 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 17 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 17 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 23 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD JULY 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 JUNE 1999, 26 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 2 DECEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PERSONS IN GREENWICH, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY (1) PROVIDING A CITIZEN ADVOCACY AND SHORT TERM (CRISIS) ADVOCACY SERVICE TO VULNERABLE OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH (2) PROMOTING THE RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE, HELP THEM OVERCOME DISCRIMINATION AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN DECISIONS ABOUT THEIR FUTURE (3) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO THOSE SUFFERING ISOLATION AND LONELINESS ASSOCIATED WITH OLD AGE
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window