BRAHMIN SAMAJ UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides services and facility to cater for Brahmin Community - celebrating various Hindu Festival, Variety performance, Organise seminars on Health and Drug awareness and general wellbeing, Sports activities and other cultural events when possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 August 1996: Standard registration
- BRAHMBANDHU (Working name)
- THE BRAHMBANDHU (UK) TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOGESH RAWAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paresh Mehta | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JYOTIKA PANDYA | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Krishna Trivedi | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aruna Jani | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kartik Mehta | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nilesh Mehta | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.83k | £11.61k | £505 | £1.76k | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.11k | £14.95k | £534 | £750 | £492 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/07/1994 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2014
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE ADVANCEMENT OF HINDU RELIGION AND CULTURE BY ADVANCING THE BRAHMIN TENETS AND BY PROVIDING HINDU PRIESTS FOR OTHER COMMUNITIES. (11) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BLAKENHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW17 8NE
- Phone:
- 02086729088
- Email:
- Secretary.bbuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window