BOSNIAN ORPHANS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We donate funds which we have raised to orphanages in Bosnia and to a charity in Mostal Croatia which provides medical and other care to people in need especially those who cannot get state medical care. We also help refugees in Bosnia and elderly people who have no state support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Croatia
Governance
- 02 August 1996: Standard registration
- 29 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2005 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £4.90k | £5.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.90k | £5.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN LIVING IN BOSNIA HERZEGOVINA WHO ARE ORPHANS AND WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY REASON OR WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER OR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE. 2) THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANY RELIEF TO SUCH ORPHANS THROUGH THE AGENCY OF OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS DEDICATED TO THEIR CARE OR RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
BOSNIA HERZEGOVINA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window