Friends of St Peter’s Church Boxted Trust

Charity Number: 1057311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assisting the congregation of St Peter's Church, Boxted, to improve the fabric and facilities of the church buildings by raising funds and managing the various projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,111
Total expenditure: £317

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • Friends of St Peter’s Church Boxted Trust (Working name)
  • BOXTED CHURCH SUPPORT TRUST (Previous name)
  • THE GEORGE PHILLIPS APPEAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James David Hardwick Trustee 11 January 2018
None on record
Angharad Charlotte Pearce Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record
STEPHEN JOHN DAY Trustee
None on record
JACQUELINE PATRICIA BUDENBERG Trustee
ADAM ROGERS TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LANGHAM ST MARY WITH BOXTED ST PETER
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £62 £42 £220 £3.05k £1.11k
Total expenditure £14.00k £0 £0 £393 £317
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HUCKLEBERRY HOUSE
CHURCH STREET
BOXTED
COLCHESTER
CO4 5SX
Phone:
01206 272297
Website:

No information available