HORSE OF THE DESERT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are still setting up this charity. It is for disabled and underprivaledged young people to be able to be with equines and to experience being in he countryside and to learn about horsemanship. It was originally aimed for crabbet arabian horses and the intention to breed from them. We have one stallion 100% crabbet arabian and would like to continue to breed him true to the authentic arabian.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 August 1996: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MRS JANETTE GOLDSWORTHY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77 | £79 | £76 | £56 | £58 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £50 | £26 | £0 | £58 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 19 August 2014 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STANDARD OF THE AUTHENTIC ARAB HORSE IN PARTICULAR BY BREEDING AND REIMPORTING PURE-BRED ARAB HORSES OF THE CRABBET LINE (ONLY HORSES WHICH SATISFY THE FOLLOWING TWO CONDITIONS SHALL BE DEEMED TO BE "OF THE CRABBET LINE": (1) DIRECTLY DESCENDED IN ALL LINES FROM THE CLASS CONSISTING OF HORSES IMPORTED FROM ARABIA BY WILFRED AND LADY ANN BLUNT OF CRABBET PARK BETWEEN 1866 AND 1894 AND TWO STALLIONS IMPORTED BY THEIR DAUGHTER LADY WENTWORTH TO CRABBET PARK NAMELY DARGEE AND SCOWRONEK (2) REGISTERED IN THE GENERAL STUD BOOK PUBLISHED BY WETHERBYS) (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING THE ACQUISITION AND DISTRIBUTION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE VARIOUS ARTS AND SCIENCES CONNECTED WITH THE USE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE ARAB HORSE (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS IN THE RIDING AND HANDLING OF ARAB HORSES (D) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO ARAB HORSES AND TO RELIEVE ARAB HORSES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF CRUELTY MALTREATMENT SICKNESS OR NEGLECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window