JERRY SAVELLE MINISTRIES (WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthers work of the Christian Church through preaching, teaching, publishing and promoting the Christian Gospel. This is done through preaching visits by Dr Jerry Savelle, the distribution of quarterly magazines and monthly teaching letters, a correspondence course and instructional CDs and DVDs. The Charity also maintains a prayer department.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Italy
Governance
- 05 August 1996: Standard registration
- JSMI (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev JOSEPH MCCROSKEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR MARK REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAMIAN PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.43k | £269.00k | £332.81k | £293.23k | £254.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.86k | £215.95k | £255.44k | £280.60k | £280.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHRISTIAN CHURCH. 2) TO PROMOTE THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL. 3) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cas Gwent Chambers
Welsh Street
Chepstow
NP16 5XG
- Phone:
- 01291628074
- Email:
- jsmieurope@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window