BRISTOL JEWISH BURIAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertaking funerals for persons of the Jewish faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 05 August 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
alan elkan | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALEXANDER SCHLESINGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEONARD GLYNN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.28k | £13.52k | £11.96k | £26.48k | £16.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.09k | £20.26k | £22.29k | £64.64k | £101.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
1) TO UNDERTAKE THE PREPARATION OF FUNERALS OF PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRACTICE OF ORTHODOX JEWS. 2) TO KEEP AND MAINTAIN THE JEWISH BURIAL GROUNDS IN BRISTOL. 3) TO AID AND ASSIST ANY OTHER JEWISH CHARITY BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN FROM THE CAPITAL OR INCOME OF THE SOCIETY IN THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 CORONATION ROAD
DOWNEND
BRISTOL
BS16 5SN
- Phone:
- 01179099036
- Email:
- alanelkan44@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window