PEOPLE FIRST (SELF ADVOCACY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
People First is an organisation run by and for people with learning difficulties to raise awareness of and campaign for the rights of people with learning difficulties and to support self advocacy groups across the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,900 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 August 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE SPOONER | Chair | 19 April 2019 |
|
|||||
kweku aswin wilson | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATE BRACKLEY | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BELLA FRANCESCA EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marie Emma Claire | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAUL ELLIFFE | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BRIAN BROOKSTEIN | Trustee | 19 April 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.18k | £279.61k | £259.51k | £173.17k | £200.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.07k | £242.63k | £249.50k | £232.25k | £190.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.35k | N/A | N/A | £40.00k | £19.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED ON 26TH JULY 1997 as amended on 21 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES IN SELF-ADVOCACY AND ALL RELATED AREAS (B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND EMOTIONAL NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE (C) TO CARRY OUT, PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF SUCH NEEDS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEOPLE FIRST
336 BRIXTON rOAD
LONDON
SW97AA
- Phone:
- 02072745484
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window