Accounts and annual returns LONG BUCKBY INFANT SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1057390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 March 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 November 2022 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required