PINEWOOD JUDO CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN THE ART OF JUDO TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS A WHOLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 08 August 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart John Cook | Chair | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Pirouz | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE RANCE | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.02k | £52.58k | £51.74k | £55.27k | £89.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.31k | £33.63k | £33.29k | £62.11k | £98.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £8.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUNE 1996 as amended on 23 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES BY ORGANISING OR PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A FACILITY WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH PUPILS TO UNDERTAKE JUDO, TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pinewood Centre
Old Wokingham Road
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG40 3AQ
- Phone:
- 01344780967
- Email:
- info@pinewoodjudoclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window