Governing document YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (BIRMINGHAM)
Charity Number: 1057470

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2008. as amended on 10 Mar 2019 as amended on 02 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PERSONS NOW RESIDING IN BIRMINGHAM WHO WERE BORN IN THE YEMEN OR ARE DESCENDANTS OF PERSONS BORN IN THE YEMEN AND IN PARTICULAR: (A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BIRMINGHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.