FRIENDS OF PULLOXHILL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To repair, restore, reconstruct, improve, enhance and preserve for the benefit of the public the fabric of St James' Church, giving priority to the structure of the building and, if any surplus remain, devoting similar attention to the church's organ, clock, furniture and other chattels and its churchyard, apportioned as the trustees shall deem fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 12 August 1996: Standard registration
- F O P C (Working name)
- FOPC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Butterworth | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FORRESTER | Trustee | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE WENSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.11k | £1.43k | £2.06k | £2.65k | £2.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.52k | £7.56k | £1.33k | £645 | £645 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 16TH MAY 1996 AS AMENDED 17TH MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO REPAIR, RESTORE, RECONSTRUCT, IMPROVE, ENHANCE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF ST. JAMES'S CHURCH, GIVING PRIORITY TO THE STRUCTURE OF THE BUILDING, AND, IF ANY SURPLUS REMAIN, DEVOTING SIMILAR ATTENTION TO THE CHURCH'S ORGAN, CLOCK, FURNITURE AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD, APPORTIONED AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
PULLOXHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 TYBURN LANE
PULLOXHILL
BEDFORD
MK45 5HG
- Phone:
- 01525712867
- Email:
- christine836@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window