Accounts and annual returns TYNEMOUTH VILLAGE DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1057489
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On Time