ST JAMES SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money to enhance St. James' pupils education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 12 August 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Clark | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Harrington | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Mirrington | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.32k | £22.68k | £21.82k | £45.81k | £49.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.67k | £18.20k | £24.98k | £36.43k | £41.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 15TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
BROMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Rc Primary School
Maybury Close
Petts Wood
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR5 1BL
- Phone:
- 07870982067
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window