Accounts and annual returns CLAIRES COURT SCHOOLS - THE COLLEGE PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1057507
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 April 2021 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 July 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required