Accounts and annual returns HERMITAGE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1057511
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 September 2024 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 October 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required