NATIONAL DRUG PREVENTION ALLIANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 1996: Standard registration
- 14 November 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 November 2005: Funds transferred to 1023135 POSITIVE PREVENTION PLUS
- N D P A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 19 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 19 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE EFFECTS OF DRUG ABUSE AND THEREBY PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY INFORMING THEM OF THE DANGERS OF SUCH ABUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window