WEST CUMBRIA GYMN CLUB

Charity number: 1057514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sport & recreation gymnastics club for children and young people which also provides training opportunities for coaches.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,015
Total expenditure: £1,870

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 August 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WEST CUMBRIA GYMNASTICS CLUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN NOAKE Trustee 09 October 1998
None on record
MICHAEL BANKS Trustee
None on record
Carolyn Carroll Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.62k £499 £1.85k £3.92k £4.01k
Total expenditure £1.77k £410 £5.03k £5.94k £1.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
38 Rannerdale Drive
WHITEHAVEN
CA28 6LA
Phone:
0194664381
Website:

No information available