Accounts and annual returns LINK AND LEARN PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1057525
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 07 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 09 August 2016 40 days late
Annual return 31 August 2014 03 November 2015 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 09 March 2016 253 days late