Financial history LINK AND LEARN PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1057525
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £45.09k £47.58k £27.20k £28.59k £15.46k
Total expenditure £41.96k £43.01k £39.91k £34.91k £18.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £26.23k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £22.82k £0 £12.95k