FOREST OF DEAN GYMNASTIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To supply gymnastics and fitness education for all ages and abilities and for those with special needs within the area of benefit which includes the Forest of Dean and Wye Valley Districts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 15 August 1996: Standard registration
- FOREST OF DEAN GYMNASTICS & FITNESS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Kitson Newland | Chair | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Simpson | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HEINER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM GOODE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.02k | £211.00k | £161.34k | £181.27k | £213.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.13k | £205.36k | £205.94k | £196.51k | £211.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 June 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 June 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 June 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 23 June 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED 12 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN FULL TIME EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ENSURING THAT ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO PHYSICAL EDUCATION AS WELL AS THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR MINDS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND ENCOURAGE INHABITANTS TO PARTICIPATE IN GYMNASTICS. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE, PARTICULARY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF THE FACILITIES BY REASON OF AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
FOREST OF DEAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOREST OF DEAN GYMNASTICS
AND FITNESS CENTRE
FIVE ACRES
COLEFORD
GLOS
GL16 7QW
- Phone:
- 01594833393
- Email:
- lynn@forestofdeangym.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window