DENEFIELD SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT TRUST CO LIMITED

Charity Number: 1057570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational Support for the students at Denefield School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £13

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 August 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE DENEFIELD TRUST (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Greenhalgh Chair 15 March 2023
None on record
Trevor Keable Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £156 £106 £44 £0 £0
Total expenditure £13 £13 £13 £13 £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Denefield School
Long Lane
Tilehurst
READING
RG31 6XY
Phone:
01189413458