Financial history HORSEHEATH CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1057618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.48k £3.10k £3.55k £4.62k £5.44k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A