Financial history FURNITURE RECYCLING PROJECT

Charity number: 1057619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £438.82k £382.86k £308.41k £476.63k £550.38k
Total expenditure £506.19k £309.26k £351.40k £430.33k £470.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.21k £249.35k £37.55k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.38k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £102.13k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £426.92k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.57k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £385
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £393.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £76.54k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0